+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 5820a
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.414
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.431
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor