+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S3393b
- Rules Report Cal.649
- Reported
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5817c
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5817b
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5817a
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor