+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5728c
- Amend And Recommit To Election Law
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5728b
- Amend And Recommit To Election Law
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5728a
- Amend And Recommit To Election Law
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor