+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.440
On October 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1059
- Substituted for s5006
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.470
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On March 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to real property taxation
+ − Vote
June 11, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 11, 2013
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor