+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.527
On November 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4241b
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.121
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.121
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5653b
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5653a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor