+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.38
- Signed Chap.686
On November 29, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.730
- Substituted For S5397
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.97
On March 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
May 30, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor