+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Recommitted to election law
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.264
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to elections
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.108
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 5581a
- Amend and recommit to election law
On March 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor