+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S3852a
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.268
- Rules Report Cal.268
- Reported
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5502a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor