+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S3337c
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.521
- Reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5477c
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5477b
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On March 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5477a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On February 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor