+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to labor
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.684
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Committed to labor
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in senate
- Returned to assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.256
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.317
- Rules report cal.317
- Reported
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On February 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to labor
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor