+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s5730
- Substituted by s5730
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.316
- Rules report cal.316
- Reported
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 5470a
- Amend (t) and recommit to transportation
On February 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor