+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.324
On July 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1700
- Substituted For S6590a
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.559
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.559
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Ways And Means
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5461b
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5461a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Vote
June 9, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor