+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S1353a
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.324
- Rules Report Cal.324
- Reported
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5428a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing