+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S1665
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.86
- Rules Report Cal.86
- Reported
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor