+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.254
- Rules report cal.254
- Reported
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 5400b
- Amend and recommit to codes
On June 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 5400a
- Amend and recommit to transportation
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor