+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5368a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor