+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On December 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.488
On December 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1429
- Substituted for s2384
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to agriculture
On January 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in senate
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.247
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to agriculture
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.106
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
+ − Vote
June 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 17, 2014
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea