+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.246
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.356
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor