+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.441
On February 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.154
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor