+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.643
On November 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1647
- Substituted For S6184a
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Ethics And Internal Governance
On May 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.243
- Rules Report Cal.243
- Reported
On May 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5308a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On March 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Vote
June 6, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor