+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.660
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Committed To Governmental Employees
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.204
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.233
- Rules Report Cal.233
- Reported
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees