+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.377
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.145
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary