+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.659
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor