+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S459
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.344
- Rules Report Cal.344
- Reported
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Libraries And Education Technology