+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S3691a
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.609
- Rules Report Cal.609
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5246a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Cities
On February 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor