+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On November 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.12
On November 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.446
On November 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- 3rd Reading Cal.1933
- Substituted For S3690
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.226
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.226
- Delivered To Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Assembly
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On February 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor