+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to banks
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.132
- Rules report cal.132
- Reported
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
- Print number 5175c
On February 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to banks
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 5175b
- Amend and recommit to banks
On February 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 5175a
- Amend and recommit to banks
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to banks
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor