+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed memo.205
On July 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.671
- Substituted for s5314a
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to investigations and government operations
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Returned to senate
- Repassed assembly
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 5172b
On May 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Recalled from senate
- Amended on third reading 5172a
- Vote reconsidered - restored to third reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.38
- Rules report cal.38
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor