+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to mental health and developmental disabilities
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.229
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to mental health and developmental disabilities
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.320
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to mental health
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor