+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 26, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 8, 2024 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On March 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On March 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On March 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor