+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.205
On October 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S3482b
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.313
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5125b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5125a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On February 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Vote
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor