+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.153
- Rules Report Cal.153
- Reported
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor