+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse
On May 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.833
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse