+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.49
On June 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.748
- Substituted for s4870
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to cultural affairs, tourism, parks and recreation
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.90
On March 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
+ − Vote
May 30, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: - May 30, 2013
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor