+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On March 11, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.141
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.760
- Rules Report Cal.760
- Reported
On May 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 19, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5048a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On February 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations