+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.194
On July 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.907
- Substituted for s4585
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to higher education
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.89
On March 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to higher education
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor