+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 4980e
On February 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 4980d
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.222
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.57
- Reported referred to ways and means
- Reported referred to rules
- Reported
- Rules report cal.57
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to elections
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Rules report cal.57
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.57
- Passed assembly
On May 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 4980c
- Amend and recommit to codes
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On April 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 4980b
- Amend and recommit to election law
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 4980a
- Amend and recommit to election law
On February 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor