+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On July 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.193
On July 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- Home rule request
- 3rd reading cal.380
- Substituted for s3182
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Home rule request
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.107
- Rules report cal.107
- Reported
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On February 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor