+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.194
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.201
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor