+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4952b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4952a
- Amend And Recommit To Children And Families
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor