+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enacting Clause Stricken
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On February 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor