+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.243
On September 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4179
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.55
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
June 1, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor