+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.50
On November 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1360
- Substituted For S520a
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On May 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.154
- Rules Report Cal.154
- Reported
On May 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4847a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On February 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
June 5, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2