+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s3539a
- Rules report cal.438
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 4833a
- Amend and recommit to insurance
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to insurance
On February 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to insurance