+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On February 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations