+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approval memo.10
On December 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.547
On December 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.221
- Substituted for s3788
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.288
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees