+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.34
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.27
- Rules report cal.27
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes