+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.182
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.159
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4760a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On February 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary