+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.109
- Signed chap.109
On July 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Home rule request
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted for s2342a
- 3rd reading cal.1477
- Home rule request
- Passed senate
- Returned to assembly
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.507
- Rules report cal.507
- Reported
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 4717a
- Amend (t) and recommit to cities
On February 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to cities
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor