+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.335
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.210
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 4708a
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On February 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor